+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-3
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-5
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-14 new
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2021: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
March 26, 2021: HB2399 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor