+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- To Election Administration Subcommittee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
+ − Statute Amended
- 10 ILCS 5/11-4.1 - from Ch. 46, par. 11-4.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor