+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 10 ILCS 5/7-12 - from Ch. 46, par. 7-12
- 10 ILCS 5/8-9 - from Ch. 46, par. 8-9
- 10 ILCS 5/10-6.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 10-6.2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor