+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On November 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- To Commercial & Property Subcommittee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Margaret Croke
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 765 ILCS 160/1-30
- 765 ILCS 605/9 - from Ch. 30, par. 309
- 765 ILCS 605/15 - from Ch. 30, par. 315
- 765 ILCS 605/18 - from Ch. 30, par. 318
- 765 ILCS 605/18.4 - from Ch. 30, par. 318.4
- 765 ILCS 605/19 - from Ch. 30, par. 319
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor