+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On March 21, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Washington
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eddie Washington
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 15 ILCS 520/2 - from Ch. 130, par. 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor