+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0141
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 011-000-000
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Special Needs Services
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2015
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Special Needs Services; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e).
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Special Needs Services
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Requires individual or group policies of accident and health insurance amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act to cover anesthetics provided by a dentist who has obtained a permit for the administration of anesthetics under the Illinois Dental Practice Act (rather than just anesthetics provided). Lowers the age of the provided coverage from 26 to 19. Provides that covered individuals shall be required to make 2 visits to the dental care provider prior to accessing provided coverage.
House Amendment 001
Includes an individual under age 26 who has been diagnosed with a developmental disability as a person for whom the charges for dental care shall be covered. Defines "developmental disability."
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (8)
May 20, 2015: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, May 20, 2015
May 18, 2015: SCA0001 - Special Needs Services - May 18, 2015
May 14, 2015: HB0235 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 14, 2015
May 6, 2015: HB0235 - Insurance - May 06, 2015
May 6, 2015: SCA0001 - Insurance - May 06, 2015
April 22, 2015: HB0235 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 22, 2015
March 26, 2015: HCA0001 - Special Needs Services - Mar 26, 2015
March 26, 2015: HB0235 - Special Needs Services - Mar 26, 2015
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor