+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (64)
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto November 4, 2003
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 094-022-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 094-022-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-007-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 and 2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Julie Hamos; Motion #1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Julie Hamos; Motion #1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Executive; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Schoenberg
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Executive; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
- Postponed - Executive
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-037-007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Housing and Urban Development Committee; 018-001-001
- Assigned to Housing and Urban Development Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ricca Slone
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randall M. Hultgren
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that provisions concerning State-municipal partnerships do not apply to a municipality under 5,000, but that a county under 25,000 may develop a housing development plan for unincorporated areas and municipalities under 5,000 and thereby become eligible for tax and other preferences.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes provisions for State-municipal housing partnerships. Amends the Illinois Housing Development Act. Provides that the Illinois Housing Development Authority may develop and implement a program of financial assistance for new teachers (employed by school districts that are financially needy or experiencing a shortage of teachers) purchasing a first home. Makes these provisions effective July 1, 2003.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes provisions for State-municipal housing partnerships. Amends the Illinois Housing Development Act. Provides that the Illinois Housing Development Authority may develop and implement a program of financial assistance for new teachers (employed by school districts that are financially needy or experiencing a shortage of teachers) purchasing a first home. Makes these provisions effective July 1, 2003.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -