+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor