+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 18, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0212
- Effective Date July 18, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 13, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Education; 009-000-000
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 20, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Calvin L. Giles
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/18-17 - from Ch. 122, par. 18-17
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2003: HB2332 - Third Reading - Friday, May 16, 2003
March 19, 2003: HB2332 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 19, 2003
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor