+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 30 ILCS 105/5.891 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-107 new -
- 35 ILCS 105/3-10 -
- 35 ILCS 105/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.9
- 35 ILCS 110/3-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.33-10
- 35 ILCS 110/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.39
- 35 ILCS 115/3-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.103-10
- 35 ILCS 115/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.109
- 35 ILCS 120/2-10 -
- 35 ILCS 120/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 442
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor