+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 7, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 120/1.01 - from Ch. 102, par. 41.01