+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (61)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 006-005-000
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Morrison
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darlene J. Senger
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 210 ILCS 30/1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4161