+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 15, 2008 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 35 ILCS 105/3-5 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.3-5
- 35 ILCS 105/3-85 -
- 35 ILCS 110/3-5 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.33-5
- 35 ILCS 110/3-70 -
- 35 ILCS 115/3-5 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.103-5
- 35 ILCS 120/2-5 - from Ch. 120, par. 441-5
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor