+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 820 ILCS 305/8 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.8
- 820 ILCS 305/8a new -
- 820 ILCS 305/16 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.16
- 820 ILCS 305/16a - from Ch. 48, par. 138.16a
- 820 ILCS 310/16 - from Ch. 48, par. 172.51
- 820 ILCS 310/16a - from Ch. 48, par. 172.51a
- 820 ILCS 310/16b new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor