+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Re-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/1-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor