+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 026-000-000
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (36)
- 215 ILCS 5/131.1 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.1
- 215 ILCS 5/131.2 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.2
- 215 ILCS 5/131.3 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.3
- 215 ILCS 5/131.4 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.4
- 215 ILCS 5/131.5 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.5
- 215 ILCS 5/131.6 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.6
- 215 ILCS 5/131.8 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.8
- 215 ILCS 5/131.8a - from Ch. 73, par. 743.8a
- 215 ILCS 5/131.9a new -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.11 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.11
- 215 ILCS 5/131.12 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.12
- 215 ILCS 5/131.12a - from Ch. 73, par. 743.12a
- 215 ILCS 5/131.13 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.13
- 215 ILCS 5/131.14 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.14
- 215 ILCS 5/131.14a new -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.14b new -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.14c new -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.14d new -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.16 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.16
- 215 ILCS 5/131.17 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.17
- 215 ILCS 5/131.18 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.18
- 215 ILCS 5/131.19 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.19
- 215 ILCS 5/131.20 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.20
- 215 ILCS 5/131.20a - from Ch. 73, par. 743.20a
- 215 ILCS 5/131.20b -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.20c new -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.21 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.21
- 215 ILCS 5/131.22 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.22
- 215 ILCS 5/131.23 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.23
- 215 ILCS 5/131.24 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.24
- 215 ILCS 5/131.26 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.26
- 215 ILCS 5/131.27 - from Ch. 73, par. 743.27
- 215 ILCS 5/131.29 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/131.30 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.9 rep. -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.12 rep. -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor