+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (99)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0709
- Effective Date August 5, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Recedes 055-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 4 - May 31, 2016
- Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 4
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Recede Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Recede Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Non-Concurs to Senate Floor Amendment No. 4
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Prevailed ; -Non-Concur
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 113-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Bush
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3, 4
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Duffy
- Waive Posting Notice
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Assigned to Executive
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Tabled
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-040-004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 010-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Adopted Amendments (10)
Senate Amendment 004
Further amends the definition of "unit of local government" or "unit" in the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code by providing that a community mental health board organized under the Community Mental Health Act is not a unit of local government under the Division.
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill. Further amends the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code by providing that a conservation district organized under the Conservation District Act is not a unit of local government under the Division.
House Amendment 006
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the Division concerning local government consolidation applies to McHenry County, Lake County, and DuPage County (currently, only counties with a population of more than 900,000 and less than 3,000,000 that are contiguous to a county with a population of more than 3,000,000). Effective immediately.
House Amendment 003
Removes a provision making the Division applicable to all counties. Provides that the Division is applicable to McHenry County and DuPage County.
House Amendment 001
Provides that the status and rights of employees represented by an exclusive bargaining representative, and the rights of employees under any existing pension, retirement, or annuity plan, are not affected by consolidation or this amendatory Act. Further provides for obligations assumed by unit of local government assuming the functions of the former governmental unit. Deletes language in the introduced bill concerning exercising the rights and responsibility of the former unit of local government and the status and rights of the employees of the former unit of local government.