+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David R. Leitch
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/7-102 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-102
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor