+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5-4.1 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-4.1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor