+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor