+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-008-005
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Public Community College Act. In the Article concerning building programs, removes dormitories from the definition of "facilities".
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 805/3-31.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-31.1
+ − Vote
March 18, 2003: HB2279 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 18, 2003
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor