+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 038-016-000
On January 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
- Second Reading
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John G. Mulroe
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
- First Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-035-000
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000
- Reported Back To Labor & Commerce Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor & Commerce Committee; 007-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To Workforce Development Subcommittee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 115 ILCS 5/12 - from Ch. 48, par. 1712
- 115 ILCS 5/4.5 rep. -
+ − Votes (4)
January 11, 2021: HB2275 - Third Reading
March 28, 2019: HB2275 - Third Reading
March 13, 2019: HB2275 - Workforce Development Subcommittee
March 13, 2019: HB2275 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor