+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/5-154 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-154
- 30 ILCS 805/8.25 new -