+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0254
- Effective Date July 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-000
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 010-003-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-031-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year (rather than the 2019-2020 school year), every public elementary school shall include in its 6th, 7th, or 8th grade curriculum at least one semester of civics education. Changes the effective date of the Act to July 1, 2020 (rather than July 1, 2019).
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2019: HB2265 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB2265 - Education
March 28, 2019: HB2265 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: HB2265 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor