+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Remains in Environment
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Environment; 006-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad E. Halbrook
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad E. Halbrook
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the introduced bill with the following changes: provides that rather than instituting a permit process for individuals to use oil field brine, the Department shall instead institute the use of oil field brine as a pilot project in Cumberland County and provides that if at any point during the pilot project the Department finds that Cumberland County or its agents have violated the provisions or that the oil field brine is causing environmental damage where applied, the Department may terminate the pilot project.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 725/6 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 5409
- 225 ILCS 725/8d new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor