+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Correctional Note Filed
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-003-000
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-14-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-14-3
+ − Vote
March 26, 2019: HB2250 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor