+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- To Finance Subcommittee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20 ILCS 1605/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 1152
- 20 ILCS 1605/9.1 -
- 20 ILCS 1605/20 - from Ch. 120, par. 1170
- 20 ILCS 1605/21.10 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor