+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On August 9, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0281
- Effective Date January 1, 2012
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2011
- Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 013-000-000
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in the provision concerning diabetes self-management training and education. Provides that diabetes self-management training shall include education programs that allow the patient to maintain an A1c level within the range identified in nationally recognized standards of care.
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 125/1-1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1401
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2011: SFA0002 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 29, 2011
May 25, 2011: HB2249 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 25, 2011
April 12, 2011: HB2249 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 12, 2011
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor