+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 25, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0751
- Effective Date January 1, 2010
- Governor Approved
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 017-000-000
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Antitrust Act. Provides that all documentary materials, transcripts, or interrogatory answers obtained by the Attorney General from law enforcement officials shall be treated as if produced pursuant to a subpoena served pursuant to the Act for purposes of maintaining the confidentiality of the information (instead of served pursuant to the Act).
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 740 ILCS 10/7 - from Ch. 38, par. 60-7
- 740 ILCS 10/7.2 - from Ch. 38, par. 60-7.2
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2009: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 30, 2009
May 20, 2009: HB2246 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 20, 2009
March 24, 2009: HB2246 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 24, 2009
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor