+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0382
- Effective Date August 16, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-000
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-051-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-7
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2019: HB2244 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: HB2244 - Criminal Law
April 11, 2019: HB2244 - Third Reading
March 5, 2019: HB2244 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor