+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ***
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 305/4a-1 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.4a-1
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: HB2239 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor