+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eileen Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/5-167.4 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-167.4
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor