+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-006-000
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.25g - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.25g
- 105 ILCS 5/27-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-6
+ − Vote
March 28, 2019: HB2234 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor