+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0204
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 16, 2003
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 115-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel J. Burke; Motion #1
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-002-005
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Ronen
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Adopted Labor & Commerce; 009-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Labor & Commerce; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-043-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Disabled Persons Rehabilitation Act. Provides that personal care attendants and personal assistants providing services under the Department of Human Services' Home Services Program shall be considered to be public employees covered by the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act, and the State shall be considered to be their employer under that Act. Provides that the State Panel of the Illinois Labor Relations Board shall have and exercise jurisdiction over personal care attendants and personal assistants under the Act, and, if the State has recognized a labor organization as the exclusive representative of personal care attendants or personal assistants prior to the effective date of this amendatory Act, then the organization shall be considered to be the exclusive representative of the personal care attendants or personal assistants. Provides that these provisions shall not be understood to limit the right of the persons receiving services to hire and fire personal care attendants and personal assistants or supervise them within the limitations set by the Home Services Program. Provides that the State shall not be considered to be the employer of personal care attendants or personal assistants for purposes of vicarious liability in tort or for purposes of statutory retirement or health insurance benefits. Provides that personal care attendants and personal assistants shall not be covered by the State Employees Group Insurance Act. Effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything. Amends the Disabled Persons Rehabilitation Act. Adds a caption to a Section concerning the legislative purpose of the Act.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2405/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 3434