+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On November 20, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
On November 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 16, 2004
On November 9, 2004 in the House:
- Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 111-001-003; Motion #2
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Accept Motion Recommends Be Not Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000; Motion #1
On November 8, 2004 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #2
On November 5, 2004 in the House:
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #1
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #1
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 8, 2004
On August 24, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 25, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-001
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-001-003
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
On May 24, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Executive; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
On May 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2004
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-044-004
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that effective July 1, 2004, Medicaid rates for nursing homes shall be increased by the difference between (i) a facility's per diem property, liability, and malpractice insurance costs as reported in the cost report filed with the Department of Public Aid and used to establish rates effective July 1, 2001 and (ii) those same costs as reported in the facility's 2002 cost report. Requires that these costs be passed through to the nursing home without caps or limitations, except for adjustments required under normal auditing procedures. Effective July 1, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5B-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 5B-2
+ − Votes (4)
November 9, 2004: HB2220 - Motion - Tuesday, November 09, 2004
May 27, 2004: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 27, 2004
May 20, 2004: HB2220 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 20, 2004
April 3, 2003: HB2220 - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor