+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor