+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-026-005
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. James D. Brosnahan
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-003-000
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. James D. Brosnahan
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. James D. Brosnahan
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 013-001-001
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. James D. Brosnahan
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. James D. Brosnahan
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James D. Brosnahan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/1-105 - from Ch. 110, par. 1-105
+ − Vote
April 4, 2003: HB2215 - Third Reading - Friday, April 04, 2003
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor