+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0133
- Effective Date July 26, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Provides that the chief executive officer must post the full financial report on a school closure on the school district's website 8 months after he or she publishes notice of the proposed school closure (rather than at the time he or she publishes notice of the proposed school closure). Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2019: HB2205 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: HB2205 - Education
April 10, 2019: HB2205 - Third Reading
March 27, 2019: HB2205 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor