+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 10, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0144
- Effective Date July 10, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 6, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 012-000-006
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Availability and Access Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Illinois Health Finance Reform Act. Makes a technical change in the Section concerning the short title.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2215/4-2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 6504-2
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2003: HB2202 - Third Reading - Friday, May 09, 2003
April 3, 2003: HB2202 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor