+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0686
- Effective Date June 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On November 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On October 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-003-000
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 26, 2021
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Labor; 011-002-000
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
- Re-assigned to Labor
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-019-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-006-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 315/3 - from Ch. 48, par. 1603
+ − Votes (4)
October 26, 2021: HB0220 - Third Reading
October 20, 2021: HB0220 - Labor
April 15, 2021: HB0220 - Third Reading
March 17, 2021: HB0220 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor