+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor