+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0195
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 008-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Consumer Protection Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz; Motion #1
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Schoenberg
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
- Postponed - Financial Institutions
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Consumer Protection Committee
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 relating to financial identity theft. Provides that a person who has learned or reasonably suspects that his or her personal identifying information has been unlawfully used by another may initiate a law enforcement investigation by contacting the local law enforcement agency that has jurisdiction over his or her actual residence, which shall take a police report of the matter, provide the complainant with a copy of that report, and begin an investigation of the facts or, if the suspected crime was committed in a different jurisdiction, refer the matter to the law enforcement agency where the suspected crime was committed for an investigation of the facts. Provides that a person who reasonably believes that he or she is the victim of financial identity theft may petition a court, or the court, on its own motion or upon application of the prosecuting attorney, may move for an expedited judicial determination of his or her factual innocence, where the perpetrator of the financial identity theft was arrested for, cited for, or convicted of a crime under the victim's identity, or where a criminal complaint has been filed against the perpetrator in the victim's name, or where the victim's identity has been mistakenly associated with a criminal conviction.