+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On December 1, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan