+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0639
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 12, 2020
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-000-000
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Jones
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2020
- Second Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2020
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
- Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
- Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
- Postponed - Insurance
- Assigned to Insurance
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-033-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 011-005-000
- Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Extends the repeal of the following by one year: the Crematory Regulation Act; the Cemetery Oversight Act; the Illinois Health Information Exchange and Technology Act; the Radiation Protection Act of 1990; the Renewable Energy, Energy Efficiency, and Coal Resources Development Law of 1997; a provision of the Illinois Power Agency Act concerning home rule preemption; the Emergency Telephone System Act; the Telecommunications Article of the Public Utilities Act; provisions of the Cable and Video Competition Article of the Public Utilities Act; the Mercury Thermostat Collection Act; and the Transportation Network Providers Act. Further amends the Emergency Telephone System Act to delay the required implementation of Next Generation 9-1-1 service until December 31, 2021 (rather than July 1, 2020) and to make conforming changes throughout the Act. Further amends the Cable and Video Competition Article of the Public Utilities Act to extend State-issued authorizations to provide cable or video service by one year. Amends the Mechanics Lien Act. In provisions concerning fixing or stipulating time for the completion of a contract or a time for payment in a contract in order to obtain a lien, extends the date that certain provisions are operative for one year. Amends Public Act 101-221. Delays, from July 1, 2020 until March 1, 2021, the effective date of the Hotel and Casino Employee Safety Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (18)
- 215 ILCS 134/45.3 new -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.32 -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.31 rep. -
- 20 ILCS 687/6-7 -
- 20 ILCS 3855/1-130 -
- 50 ILCS 750/3 - from Ch. 134, par. 33
- 50 ILCS 750/15.3 - from Ch. 134, par. 45.3
- 50 ILCS 750/15.3a -
- 50 ILCS 750/15.6b -
- 50 ILCS 750/30 -
- 50 ILCS 750/99 -
- 220 ILCS 5/13-1200 -
- 220 ILCS 5/21-401 -
- 220 ILCS 5/21-1601 -
- 415 ILCS 98/55 -
- 625 ILCS 57/34 -
- 770 ILCS 60/6 - from Ch. 82, par. 6
- P.A. 101-221, Sec. 99-99 -