+ − Summary
+ − Actions (35)
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
- Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia