+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0411
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-019-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 011-004-001
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-043-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; 009-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
- House Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 003
Removes provisions concerning referral services related to conversion therapy. Provides that no person or entity may, in the conduct of any trade or commerce, use or employ any deception, fraud, false pretense, false promise, misrepresentation, or the concealment, suppression, or omission of any material fact in advertising or otherwise offering conversion therapy services in a manner that represents homosexuality as a mental disease, disorder, or illness, with intent that others rely upon the concealment, suppression, or omission of such material fact. Provides that violation of the provisions constitutes an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes conforming changes in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that (i) any sexual orientation change efforts attempted on a person under the age of 18 by a mental health provider may (was, shall) be considered unprofessional conduct and (ii) mental health providers found to have engaged in a sexual orientation change effort on a patient under the age of 18 may (was, shall) be subject to discipline by the licensing entity or disciplinary review board with competent jurisdiction.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 815 ILCS 505/2Z - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 262Z