+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 30, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0065
- Effective Date July 1, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-027-000
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2011
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Held in Appropriations I
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-037-001
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 013-001-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to various agencies. Effective July 1, 2011.