+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 65 ILCS 5/7-1-8 - from Ch. 24, par. 7-1-8
- 65 ILCS 5/7-1-13 - from Ch. 24, par. 7-1-13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor