+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0251
- Effective Date August 9, 2019
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Higher Education
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 019-000-000
- Assigned to Mental Health Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that 2 years after the effective date of the Act, and once every 5 years thereafter, the Technical Assistance Center must propose to the General Assembly an updated ratio of clinical, non-student staff members to students based on actual ratios in this State and any new information related to appropriate benchmarks for clinician-to-student ratios. Provides that the updated benchmark must represent a ratio of no less than one clinical, non-student staff member to 1,250 students. Removes a provision providing that 5 years after the effective date of the Act, each public college or university must maintain a ratio of one clinical, non-student staff member to 1,000 students. Provides that the monitoring measures of local partnership programs must include the ratio of clinical, non-student staff to student population and the number of linkage agreements and contracts in place based on student population (rather than only the number of linkage agreements and contracts in place based on student population). Provides that the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability, in conjunction with the Illinois Community College Board and the Board of Higher Education, must make recommendations to the General Assembly on the amounts necessary to implement the Act. Provides that the initial recommendation must be provided by the Commission no later than December 31, 2019 and any appropriation provided in advance of this recommendation may be used for planning purposes. Provides that no provision of the Act may be funded by student fees created on or after July 1, 2020 (rather than new student fees). Makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2020, except that certain provisions are effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -