+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 14, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0822
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 1, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 014-000-000
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 605 ILCS 10/2 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-2